WY SF0056 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Assigned Chapter Number 109
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Assigned Chapter Number 109
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to gaming; codifying provisions governing skill based amusement games; modifying skill based amusement game laboratory reporting requirements; amending rulemaking authority of the Wyoming gaming commission; providing and amending definitions; providing for criminal background checks as specified; providing for application of the Wyoming Administrative Procedure Act; requiring applicable fees to be paid on an annual basis; allowing applicable taxes to be prepaid; requiring a report; repealing the sunset date applicable to skill based amusement games; providing a process and criteria for application approval, denial, revocation and suspension; providing a grace period for persons to comply with provisions of this act; requiring the Wyoming gaming commission to review previously submitted skill based amusement game applications; classifying peace officers employed by the Wyoming gaming commission as law enforcement officers under the Wyoming Retirement Act; conforming the definition of skill based amusement game and making other conforming amendments; repealing noncodified law; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Wyoming gaming commission-modifications and corrections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - Concur:Passed 27-2-0-0-1 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 46-14-0-0-0 (Y: 46 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-2-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 22-5-1-1-1 (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 46-14-0-0-0 (Y: 46 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-2-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 22-5-1-1-1 (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-05 | Assigned Chapter Number 109 | |
2021-04-05 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0044 | |
2021-04-01 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0044 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0044 |
2021-04-01 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0044 | |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Concur:Passed 27-2-0-0-1 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2021-03-29 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 46-14-0-0-0 |
2021-03-26 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-25 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-03-04 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-04 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-2-0-0-0 |
2021-02-05 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2021-02-02 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-02-01 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 22-5-1-1-1 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-01-28 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-01-27 | Senate | S06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-01-11 | Bill Number Assigned |