WY SF0054 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Speaker Signed SEA No. 0006
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Speaker Signed SEA No. 0006
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to water development; establishing requirements related to operations and maintenance of water projects; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Water development project requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0006 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0006 |
2018-03-05 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0006 | |
2018-03-05 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 |
2018-03-02 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-03-01 | House | COW:Passed |
2018-02-27 | House | Placed on General File |
2018-02-27 | House | H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 |
2018-02-23 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture |
2018-02-19 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-19 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-15 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-02-14 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 29-0-1-0-0 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-01-23 | Bill Number Assigned |