WY SF0051 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 15 2023 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-03 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 15 2023 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-03 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to school finance; modifying the Wyoming cost-of-living index as used in the regional cost adjustment within the education resource block grant model as specified; providing a sunset date; and providing for an effective date.
Title
School finance-regional cost adjustment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-16 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-29-2-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-02-15 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 45-16-1-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 16-15-0-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-16 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 45-16-1-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 16-15-0-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-16 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | Senate | postponed indefinitely |
2023-02-21 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Concur:Failed 0-29-2-0-0 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2023-02-15 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 45-16-1-0-0 |
2023-02-14 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-13 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-02-10 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-02-10 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2023-02-08 | House | :Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2023-02-08 | House | H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2023-02-06 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education |
2023-01-24 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-19 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 16-15-0-0-0 |
2023-01-18 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-17 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-01-16 | Senate | S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education |
2022-12-28 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2022-12-09 | Bill Number Assigned |