WY SF0050 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Chapter No. 172 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Chapter No. 172 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to administration of the government; amending provisions relating to tribal liaisons; repealing and conforming provisions; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Tribal liaisons.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - Senate - Concur:Passed 26-3-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Concur:Passed 26-3-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-13-3-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-13-3-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-0-2-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-0-2-0 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Concur:Passed 26-3-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-13-3-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-13-3-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-0-2-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-0-2-0 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | Chapter No. 172 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015 | |
2015-03-12 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2015-03-12 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0074 | |
2015-03-04 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0074 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0074 |
2015-03-04 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0074 | |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Concur:Passed 26-3-1-0-0 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2015-03-03 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 44-13-3-0-0 |
2015-03-02 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-27 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-02-24 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-02-24 | Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-18 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2015-02-03 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-02-02 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0-0 |
2015-01-30 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-01-29 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-01-29 | Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-27 | Senate | COW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-01-27 | Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-0-2-0-0 | |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-08 | Bill Number Assigned |