WY SF0049 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the safe school and climate act; clarifying application of the act; modifying requirements; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Safe school and climate act amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-06 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-13 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-1-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-11 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-13 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-1-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-11 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-27 | House | COW:H Did not consider for COW |
2023-02-06 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-02-06 | House | H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2023-02-03 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education |
2023-01-13 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-13 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-1-0-0-0 |
2023-01-12 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-11 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-01-11 | Senate | S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education |
2022-12-28 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2022-12-09 | Bill Number Assigned |