WY SF0048 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 9 2023 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-03 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 9 2023 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-03 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; requiring the state superintendent to develop model rules and policies for student discipline, including suspension and expulsion of students; requiring reporting; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Education-suspension and expulsion model policies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-03 - House - Did Not Adopt SF0048JC001: 5-50-7-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2023-03-03 - Senate - Adopted SF0048JC001: 26-1-4-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-31-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-09 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-18-0-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-13 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-11 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Senate - Adopted SF0048JC001: 26-1-4-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-31-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-09 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-18-0-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-13 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-11 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | Senate | postponed indefinitely |
2023-02-15 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Concur:Failed 0-31-0-0-0 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2023-02-09 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 44-18-0-0-0 |
2023-02-08 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-07 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-02-06 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-02-06 | House | H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2023-02-03 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education |
2023-01-13 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-13 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-12 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-11 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-01-11 | Senate | S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education |
2022-12-28 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2022-12-09 | Bill Number Assigned |