WY SF0045 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 103
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to opiate antagonists; defining the terms entity and opioid for purposes of the Emergency Administration of Opiate Antagonist Act; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency administration of opiate antagonist-revisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-09 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26 Assigned Chapter Number 103
2019-02-26 Governor Signed SEA No. 0055
2019-02-22HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0055
2019-02-21SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0055
2019-02-21 Assigned Number SEA No. 0055
2019-02-21House3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0
2019-02-21House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-20HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-14HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-14HouseH10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0
2019-02-01HouseIntroduced and Referred to H10 - Labor
2019-01-17HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-11Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2019-01-10Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-09SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-09SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-09SenateS10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-01-08SenateIntroduced and Referred to S10 - Labor
2019-01-08SenateReceived for Introduction
2018-12-28 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback