WY SF0045 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-04 - Chapter No. 112 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-04 - Chapter No. 112 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the administration of government and privacy; specifying staffing for the digital information privacy task force; designating the committees to receive task force report; reappropriating money; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Digital information privacy task force- reappropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-1-2-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-1-1-0 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-1-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-1-2-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-1-1-0 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-1-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | Chapter No. 112 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015 | |
2015-03-04 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2015-03-04 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0042 | |
2015-02-27 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0042 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0042 |
2015-02-27 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0042 | |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Concur:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2015-02-26 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 57-1-2-0-0 |
2015-02-25 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-24 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-02-18 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-02-18 | Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-10 | House | COW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2015-02-10 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-02-10 | Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-06 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2015-01-29 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-29 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2015-01-28 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-01-27 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-01-26 | Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 | |
2015-01-22 | Senate | COW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-01-22 | Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-1-1-0 | |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-07 | Bill Number Assigned |