WY SF0045 | 2010 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to school buses; prohibiting evidentiary admissibility and limiting liability related to use of seat belts on school buses; and providing for an effective date.
Title
School bus seat belts.
Sponsors
Sen. Kit Jennings [R] | Rep. Del McOmie [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-15 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - S04 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S04 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - S04 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S04 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-09 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2010-03-09 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0039 | |
2010-03-04 | (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0039 | |
2010-03-04 | (S) President Signed SEA No. 0039 | |
2010-03-03 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0039 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-03-01 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-26 | (H08) Recommended Do Pass | |
2010-02-17 | (H) Rereferred to H08 | |
2010-02-17 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H04 | |
2010-02-16 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2010-02-15 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-11 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-10 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-10 | (S04) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2010-02-09 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S04 | |
2010-02-08 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2010-02-01 | Bill Number Assigned |