WY SF0043 | 2014 | Budget Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to prioritization of municipal solid waste facilities cease and transfer projects; authorizing expenditure of previously appropriated funds; establishing a prioritized list of projects; establishing a maximum amount to be expended on the project listed; authorizing the department of environmental quality limited discretionary authority to modify the prioritized list; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prioritization of municipal solid waste facility projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-28 - Senate - S Did Concur (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - H09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - S09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - S09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S09 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S09 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-11 Assigned Chapter Number
2014-03-10 Governor Signed SEA0024
2014-03-04HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0024
2014-03-04SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0024
2014-02-28 Assigned Number SEA0024
2014-02-28SenateDid Concur
2014-02-27SenateReceived for Concurrence
2014-02-27HousePassed 3rd Reading
2014-02-26HousePassed 2nd Reading
2014-02-25HousePassed CoW
2014-02-25 Amendment Adopted
2014-02-25HouseAmendments Adopted
2014-02-21HousePlaced on General File
2014-02-21HouseRecommended Amend and Do Pass
2014-02-19HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09
2014-02-18HouseReceived for Introduction
2014-02-17SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2014-02-17 Amendment Adopted
2014-02-14SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2014-02-13SenatePassed CoW
2014-02-13 Amendment Adopted
2014-02-13SenateAmendments Adopted
2014-02-12SenatePlaced on General File
2014-02-12SenateRecommended Amend and Do Pass
2014-02-11SenateIntroduced and Referred to S09
2014-02-10SenateReceived for Introduction
2014-01-08 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback