WY SF0043 | 2010 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-03 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-03 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to game and fish; providing for regulation of the administration of a special hunting season extension for hunters with disabilities; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Game and fish-special hunting season extension.
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Childers [R] | Sen. Henry Coe [R] | Rep. Elaine Harvey [R] | Sen. John Hastert [D] |
Rep. Allen Jaggi [R] | Rep. Terry Kimble [D] | Sen. Mike Massie [D] | Rep. Saundra Meyer [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-22 - House - H06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - S06 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S06 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - S06 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S06 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2010-03-03 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0006 | |
2010-03-01 | (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0006 | |
2010-03-01 | (S) President Signed SEA No. 0006 | |
2010-02-26 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0006 | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-02-25 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-24 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-22 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-22 | (H06) Recommended Do Pass | |
2010-02-17 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H06 | |
2010-02-17 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2010-02-16 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-02-15 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-11 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-11 | (S06) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2010-02-09 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S06 | |
2010-02-08 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2010-02-01 | Bill Number Assigned |