WY SF0042 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Placed on General File
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to nicotine products; requiring age verification for remote sales of nicotine products; specifying shipping requirements for nicotine products; modifying definitions related to nicotine products; providing penalties; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nicotine products–age verification and shipping.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-1-1-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27HousePlaced on General File
2020-02-27HouseH03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-1-1-0
2020-02-24HouseIntroduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue
2020-02-20HouseReceived for Introduction
2020-02-19Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2020-02-18Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2020-02-17SenateCOW:Passed
2020-02-13SenatePlaced on General File
2020-02-13SenateS03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2020-02-11SenateIntroduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue 29-0-1-0-0
2020-02-10SenateReceived for Introduction
2020-01-17 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback