WY SF0042 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-24 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-24 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to motor vehicle license plates; expanding the distinctive license plate options available for free to disabled veterans; specifying fees; specifying application procedures; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Choice license plates for disabled veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-14 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - H08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-13 - Senate - S08 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - H08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-13 - Senate - S08 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-24 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2011-02-18 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0020 | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0020 | |
2011-02-15 | (S) President Signed SEA No. 0020 | |
2011-02-14 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0020 | |
2011-02-14 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2011-02-09 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2011-01-18 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-01-17 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-14 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2011-01-13 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2011-01-13 | (S08) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2011-01-11 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S08 | |
2011-01-11 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2010-12-21 | Bill Number Assigned |