WY SF0042 | 2010 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to school finance; establishing and funding the supplemental assistance program for student enrichment instruction; establishing assistance criteria and imposing duties upon the department of education; imposing reporting requirements; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
School finance-student enrichment instruction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-04 - Senate - S Did Concur (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - H04 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - S04 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S04 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - H04 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - S04 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S04 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-09 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2010-03-09 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0044 | |
2010-03-05 | (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0044 | |
2010-03-04 | (S) President Signed SEA No. 0044 | |
2010-03-04 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0044 | |
2010-03-04 | (S) Did Concur | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Received for Concurrence | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-03-01 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-25 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-25 | (H02) Recommended Do Pass | |
2010-02-23 | (H) Rereferred to H02 | |
2010-02-23 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-23 | (H04) Recommended Do Pass | |
2010-02-17 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H04 | |
2010-02-17 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2010-02-17 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-02-16 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-15 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-15 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-15 | (S02) Recommended Do Pass | |
2010-02-10 | (S) Rereferred to S02 | |
2010-02-10 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-10 | (S04) Recommended Do Pass | |
2010-02-08 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S04 | |
2010-02-08 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2010-02-01 | Bill Number Assigned |