WY SF0040 | 2012 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on March 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-16 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on March 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-16 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the judicial branch; increasing salaries of supreme court, district court and circuit court judges as specified; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Judicial salaries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - House - H Adopted SF0040JC01 (Y: 46 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - S Adopted SF0040JC01 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - S Adopted SF0040JC01 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - S Did Not Concur (Y: 15 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 45 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - H Objection to Lay Back Pursuant to HR 9-3 Sustained (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - S Did Not Concur (Y: 15 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 45 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - H Objection to Lay Back Pursuant to HR 9-3 Sustained (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S02 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S02 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
1969-12-31 - Senate - (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
1969-12-31 - Senate - (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
1969-12-31 - Senate - (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-06 - Senate - S Adopted SF0040JC01 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - S Adopted SF0040JC01 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - S Did Not Concur (Y: 15 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 45 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - H Objection to Lay Back Pursuant to HR 9-3 Sustained (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - S Did Not Concur (Y: 15 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 45 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - H Objection to Lay Back Pursuant to HR 9-3 Sustained (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S02 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S02 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
1969-12-31 - Senate - (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
1969-12-31 - Senate - (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
1969-12-31 - Senate - (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-16 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2012-03-15 | Governor Signed SEA0054 | |
2012-03-07 | (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0054 | |
2012-03-07 | (S) President Signed SEA No. 0054 | |
2012-03-07 | Assigned Number SEA0054 | |
2012-03-07 | (H) Adopted SF0040JC01 | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Adopted SF0040JC01 | |
2012-03-05 | (H) Appointed JCC01 Members | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Appointed JCC01 Members | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Did Not Concur | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Received for Concurrence | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Objection to Lay Back Pursuant to HR 9-3 Sustained | |
2012-03-01 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-03-01 | Amendment Failed | |
2012-02-29 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2012-02-29 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-29 | (H) Amendments Adopted | |
2012-02-27 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2012-02-27 | (H02) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2012-02-23 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H02 | |
2012-02-23 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2012-02-22 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-02-21 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-02-21 | Amendment Failed | |
2012-02-21 | Amendment Failed | |
2012-02-20 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2012-02-20 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-20 | (S) Amendments Adopted | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2012-02-17 | (S02) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2012-02-14 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S02 | |
2012-02-13 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2012-01-24 | Bill Number Assigned |