WY SF0037 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Did Not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Did Not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to professional licensing; adopting the Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact; authorizing the temporary and telemedicine based provision of psychology services by psychologists not licensed to practice psychology in Wyoming; providing for participation in the compact; making conforming amendments; assigning duties to the Wyoming state board of psychology; authorizing the fingerprinting and background investigation of psychology license applicants and license renewals; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Did Not Consider for Introduction |
2020-02-25 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-24 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-20 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-02-14 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 27-2-1-0-0 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-01-13 | Bill Number Assigned |