WY SF0037 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - Chapter No. 119 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to boards and commissions; modifying the political party affiliation requirements on specified boards and commissions; removing party affiliation requirements from specified boards and commissions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Boards and commissions party affiliation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-02 - House - Adopted SF0037JC001: 42-16-2-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Adopted SF0037JC001: 26-4-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-30-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-10-2-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 24-5-1-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-16 Chapter No. 119 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
2016-03-16 Assigned Chapter Number
2016-03-15 Governor Signed SEA No. 0050
2016-03-03HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0050
2016-03-03SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0050
2016-03-03 Assigned Number SEA No. 0050
2016-03-02HouseAdopted SF0037JC001: 42-16-2-0-0
2016-03-02SenateAdopted SF0037JC001: 26-4-0-0-0
2016-03-01HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2016-03-01SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2016-03-01SenateConcur:Failed 0-30-0-0-0
2016-03-01SenateReceived for Concurrence
2016-02-29House3rd Reading:Passed 48-10-2-0-0
2016-02-26House3rd Reading:Laid Back
2016-02-25House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-24HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-23HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-23 H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
2016-02-18HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2016-02-17HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-02-16Senate3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0-0
2016-02-15Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-12Senate2nd Reading:Laid Back
2016-02-11SenateCOW:Passed
2016-02-09SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-09 S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-08SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 24-5-1-0-0
2016-02-05SenateReceived for Introduction
2016-01-20 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback