WY SF0037 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Chapter No. 43 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Chapter No. 43 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to administration of government; specifying powers and duties of the department of enterprise technology services over data privacy; specifying that department data privacy policies and standards shall be the minimum privacy requirements adhered to by state agencies; and providing for an effective date.
Title
State protection of data privacy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-20 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-1-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-1-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-25 | Chapter No. 43 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015 | |
2015-02-25 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2015-02-25 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0019 | |
2015-02-23 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0019 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0019 |
2015-02-20 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0019 | |
2015-02-20 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 |
2015-02-19 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-18 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-02-10 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-02-10 | Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-06 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2015-01-26 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-26 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2015-01-23 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-01-22 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-01-22 | Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-1-1-0 | |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2014-12-31 | Bill Number Assigned |