WY SF0037 | 2012 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-21 - (S) Placed on General File; Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-21 - (S) Placed on General File; Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to Medicaid; providing an appropriation to reduce the number of persons on waiting lists for services under the home and community based waiver programs; requiring notice from the governor if waiting lists exceed specified limits; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Medicaid waiver funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-21 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Not Pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - S10 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S10 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - S10 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S10 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-21 | (S) Placed on General File; Did Not Consider in CoW | |
2012-02-21 | (S02) Recommended Do Not Pass | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Rereferred to S02 | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2012-02-17 | (S10) Recommended Do Pass | |
2012-02-14 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S10 | |
2012-02-13 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2012-01-20 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2012/Digest/SF0037.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2012/Introduced/SF0037.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2012/Digest/SF0037.htm |