WY SF0037 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 25 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-25 - (H) Passed 3rd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 25 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-25 - (H) Passed 3rd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to insurance; amending the definition of "private health benefit plan"; providing exceptions to the definition of "disability insurance"; providing for applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Health insurance definitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-25 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - H10 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - S10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - H10 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - S10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-25 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-24 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-23 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2011-02-17 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2011-02-17 | (H10) Recommended Do Pass | |
2011-02-01 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H10 | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-27 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-25 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2011-01-24 | (S10) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2011-01-11 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S10 | |
2011-01-11 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2010-12-20 | Bill Number Assigned |