WY SF0036 | 2010 | Budget Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to water development; providing amendments to the Gillette Madison pipeline project; providing authorization; specifying conditions; providing appropriations and funding; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gillette Madison water project.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-03-04 - Senate - S Adopted SF0036JC01 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - S Did Not Concur (Y: 0 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-02-23 - House - H05 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - S05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S05 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-11 Assigned Chapter Number
2010-03-11 Governor Signed SEA No. 0050
2010-03-05 (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0050
2010-03-05 (S) President Signed SEA No. 0050
2010-03-05 Assigned Number SEA No. 0050
2010-03-05 (H) Adopted SF0036JC01
2010-03-04 (S) Adopted SF0036JC01
2010-03-04 (H) Appointed JCC01 Members
2010-03-03 (S) Appointed JCC01 Members
2010-03-03 (S) Did Not Concur
2010-03-03 (S) Received for Concurrence
2010-03-02 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2010-03-01 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2010-02-26 (H) Passed CoW
2010-02-23 (H) Placed on General File
2010-02-23 (H02) Recommended Do Pass
2010-02-23 (H) Rereferred to H02
2010-02-23 (H) Placed on General File
2010-02-23 (H05) Recommended Do Pass
2010-02-18 (H) Introduced and Referred to H05
2010-02-18 (H) Received for Introduction
2010-02-18 (S) Passed 3rd Reading
2010-02-17 (S) Passed 2nd Reading
2010-02-16 (S) Passed CoW
2010-02-16 (S) Placed on General File
2010-02-16 (S02) Recommended Do Pass
2010-02-12 (S) Rereferred to S02
2010-02-12 (S) Placed on General File
2010-02-12 (S05) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2010-02-09 (S) Introduced and Referred to S05
2010-02-08 (S) Received for Introduction
2010-01-26 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback