WY SF0035 | 2012 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-06 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-06 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public funds; providing for retention of earnings in the Hathaway student scholarship and excellence in higher education endowment reserve accounts; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Higher education reserve accounts.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2012-03-02 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S02 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S02 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2012-03-06 | Governor Signed SEA0012 | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0012 | |
2012-03-02 | (S) President Signed SEA No. 0012 | |
2012-03-02 | Assigned Number SEA0012 | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-03-01 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-02-29 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2012-02-24 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2012-02-24 | (H02) Recommended Do Pass | |
2012-02-23 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H02 | |
2012-02-22 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2012-02-22 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-02-21 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-02-20 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2012-02-17 | (S02) Recommended Do Pass | |
2012-02-13 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S02 | |
2012-02-13 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2012-01-19 | Bill Number Assigned |