WY SF0034 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on February 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-24 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on February 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-24 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to crimes and offenses; creating the crime of trespass by small unmanned aircraft; providing a penalty; providing definitions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Trespass by small unmanned aircraft.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-10 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Do Pass Failed 2-7-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-20 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 18-13-0-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 18-13-0-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-24 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2023-02-24 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2023-02-10 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Do Pass Failed 2-7-0-0-0 |
2023-02-06 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2023-01-20 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-20 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 18-13-0-0-0 |
2023-01-19 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-18 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-01-18 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2022-12-28 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2022-12-06 | Bill Number Assigned |