WY SF0033 | 2010 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-05 - (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-05 - (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to crimes and offenses; adding specified violations of protection orders as actions for which an enhanced penalty for stalking may be imposed; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Stalking penalties.
Sponsors
Sen. Bernadine Craft [D] | Rep. Keith Gingery [R] | Rep. Debbie Hammons [D] | Sen. John Hastert [D] |
Rep. Saundra Meyer [D] | Sen. Kathryn Sessions [D] | Rep. Tim Stubson [R] | Rep. Mary Throne [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-09 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S01; No Report Prior to COW Cutoff; Intro Vote (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-05 | (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c) | |
2010-02-09 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S01; No Report Prior to COW Cutoff; Intro Vote | |
2010-02-08 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2010-01-22 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2010/Digest/SF0033.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2010/Introduced/SF0033.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2010/Digest/SF0033.htm |