WY SF0030 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-15 - COW:Failed 14-16-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to child support; providing for court ordered deviation from presumptive child support payments when an obligor is incarcerated; specifying when a court may order an incarcerated person's assets sold and distributed for child support payments; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child support-use of inmate's assets.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-15 - Senate - COW:Failed 14-16-0-0-0 (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-14 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-15SenateCOW:Failed 14-16-0-0-0
2019-01-14SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-14SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2019-01-08SenateReceived for Introduction
2018-12-24 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback