WY SF0024 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Chapter No. 181 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to public utilities; removing territorial limits on Wyoming infrastructure authority projects; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wyoming infrastructure authority amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-05 - House - Adopted SF0024JC001: 55-2-3-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Adopted SF0024JC001: 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - Adopted SF0024JC001: 55-2-3-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Adopted SF0024JC001: 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Concur:Failed 3-26-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Concur:Failed 3-26-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 43-16-1-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 43-16-1-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-3-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-3-1-0 (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-3-1-0 (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - Senate - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - Senate - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - Senate - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-12 Chapter No. 181 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
2015-03-12 Assigned Chapter Number
2015-03-12 Governor Signed SEA No. 0086
2015-03-05HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0086
2015-03-05SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0086
2015-03-05 Assigned Number SEA No. 0086
2015-03-05HouseAdopted SF0024JC001: 55-2-3-0-0
2015-03-05SenateAdopted SF0024JC001: 27-2-1-0-0
2015-03-04HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2015-03-04SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2015-03-04SenateConcur:Failed 3-26-1-0-0
2015-03-04SenateReceived for Concurrence
2015-03-03House3rd Reading:Passed 43-16-1-0-0
2015-03-02House2nd Reading:Passed
2015-02-27HouseCOW:Passed
2015-02-18HousePlaced on General File
2015-02-18 Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2015-02-11HouseCOW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2015-02-11HousePlaced on General File
2015-02-11 Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0
2015-02-06HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
2015-01-23HouseReceived for Introduction
2015-01-21Senate3rd Reading:Passed 26-3-1-0-0
2015-01-20Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2015-01-19Senate2nd Reading:Laid Back
2015-01-16SenateCOW:Passed
2015-01-14SenateCOW:Laid Back
2015-01-14SenatePlaced on General File
2015-01-14 Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2015-01-13SenateIntroduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals
2015-01-13SenateReceived for Introduction
2014-12-24 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback