WY SF0024 | 2014 | Budget Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to special elections; providing for declaration of any part of election results to be null and void; providing for limited special election voting as specified; providing for appeals; providing a process for limited special election voting; amending time periods for special elections; providing for rules and regulations; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special elections-revisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-04 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - H07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - S07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S07 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-11 Assigned Chapter Number
2014-03-10 Governor Signed SEA0045
2014-03-05HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0045
2014-03-05SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0045
2014-03-04 Assigned Number SEA0045
2014-03-04HousePassed 3rd Reading
2014-03-03HousePassed 2nd Reading
2014-02-28HousePassed CoW
2014-02-27HousePlaced on General File
2014-02-27HouseRecommended Do Pass
2014-02-25HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07
2014-02-25HouseReceived for Introduction
2014-02-24SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2014-02-21SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2014-02-20SenatePassed CoW
2014-02-20 Amendment Adopted
2014-02-20SenateAmendments Adopted
2014-02-18SenatePlaced on General File
2014-02-18SenateRecommended Amend and Do Pass
2014-02-10SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07
2014-02-10SenateReceived for Introduction
2013-12-16 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback