WY SF0020 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-28 - 3rd Reading:Failed 9-21-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to cities and towns; granting to cities and towns the authority to fund surface water drainage systems by service charges as specified; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Surface water drainage systems.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 9-21-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-24 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-28Senate3rd Reading:Failed 9-21-0-0-0
2019-01-25Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-24SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-24SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-24SenateS07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2019-01-11SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
2019-01-08SenateReceived for Introduction
2018-12-18 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback