WY SF0020 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Chapter No. 33 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to sales and use tax; providing that sales and use tax erroneously collected from a taxpayer shall not be refunded or credited to the vendor except as specified; repealing a conflicting provision; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and use tax remedy revisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-07 Chapter No. 33 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
2016-03-07 Assigned Chapter Number
2016-03-04 Governor Signed SEA No. 0023
2016-02-29HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0023
2016-02-29SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0023
2016-02-29 Assigned Number SEA No. 0023
2016-02-29House3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0
2016-02-26House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-25HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-24HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-24 H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2016-02-17HouseIntroduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue
2016-02-16HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-02-12Senate3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0
2016-02-11Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-10SenateCOW:Passed
2016-02-09SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-09 S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0
2016-02-08SenateIntroduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue 30-0-0-0-0
2016-02-05SenateReceived for Introduction
2016-01-07 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback