WY SF0020 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Chapter No. 29 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to school finance; eliminating the reduction of recapture payments for school districts levying more than the statewide average mill levy for the repayment of bonded indebtedness; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School finance-excess mill levy rebate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-20 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - Senate - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-25 Chapter No. 29 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
2015-02-25 Assigned Chapter Number
2015-02-25 Governor Signed SEA No. 0015
2015-02-23HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0015
2015-02-23SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0015
2015-02-20 Assigned Number SEA No. 0015
2015-02-20House3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0
2015-02-19House2nd Reading:Passed
2015-02-18HouseCOW:Passed
2015-02-10HousePlaced on General File
2015-02-10 Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2015-02-10HouseCOW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2015-02-10HousePlaced on General File
2015-02-10 Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2015-02-06HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04 - Education
2015-01-16HouseReceived for Introduction
2015-01-15Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0
2015-01-15Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2015-01-14SenateCOW:Passed
2015-01-14SenatePlaced on General File
2015-01-14 Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2015-01-13SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04 - Education
2015-01-13SenateReceived for Introduction
2014-12-22 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback