WY SF0018 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Chapter No. 82 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to capital construction; authorizing specification of suggested brands and manufacturers for procurement of furniture and moveable equipment; requiring allowance of substitutions of similar products; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Competitive bid specification requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-02 - Senate - Concur:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-07 Chapter No. 82 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
2016-03-07 Assigned Chapter Number
2016-03-04 Governor Signed SEA No. 0046
2016-03-03HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0046
2016-03-03SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0046
2016-03-02 Assigned Number SEA No. 0046
2016-03-02SenateConcur:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2016-03-02SenateReceived for Concurrence
2016-03-02House3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0
2016-03-01House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-29HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-26HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-26 H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2016-02-23HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
2016-02-23HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-02-22Senate3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0
2016-02-19Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-18SenateCOW:Passed
2016-02-15SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-15 S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2016-02-08SenateIntroduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals 29-1-0-0-0
2016-02-05SenateReceived for Introduction
2016-01-07 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback