WY SF0018 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-18 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-18 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to commercial driving; regulating the issuance of commercial drivers licenses; specifying prohibited acts; providing and amending penalties; exempting from deferred prosecution provisions commercial drivers charged with specified violations involving motor vehicles; requiring the disclosure of specified information; requiring compliance with federal, state and local laws; amending definitions; amending legal references; repealing an unnecessary statute; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Federal Motor Carrier Safety Act Compliance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-14 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - H08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-13 - Senate - S08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - H08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-13 - Senate - S08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-18 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2011-02-18 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0018 | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0018 | |
2011-02-15 | (S) President Signed SEA No. 0018 | |
2011-02-14 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0018 | |
2011-02-14 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2011-02-09 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2011-02-09 | (H08) Recommended Do Pass | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H08 | |
2011-01-18 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-18 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-01-17 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-14 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2011-01-13 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2011-01-13 | (S08) Recommended Do Pass | |
2011-01-11 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S08 | |
2011-01-11 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2010-12-06 | Bill Number Assigned |