WY SF0017 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Chapter No. 90 Session Laws of Wyoming 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Chapter No. 90 Session Laws of Wyoming 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to prioritization of municipal solid waste facilities cease and transfer projects; authorizing expenditure of previously appropriated funds; establishing a prioritized list of projects; establishing a maximum amount to be expended on projects; granting the department of environmental quality limited discretionary authority to modify the prioritized list; providing definitions; repealing a prior list of priority cease and transfer projects; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Cease and transfer priority list.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | Chapter No. 90 Session Laws of Wyoming 2018 | |
2018-03-16 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0041 | |
2018-03-16 | Assigned Chapter Number 90 | |
2018-03-10 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0041 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0041 |
2018-03-09 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0041 | |
2018-03-08 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 |
2018-03-07 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-03-06 | House | COW:Passed |
2018-03-02 | House | Placed on General File |
2018-03-02 | House | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2018-03-01 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2018-03-01 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-27 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-22 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-02-21 | Senate | S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals 29-0-1-0-0 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-12-18 | Bill Number Assigned |