WY SF0017 | 2010 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-24 - (H) Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-24 - (H) Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to property; providing that a statement of consideration for residential property is a public document; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Statement of consideration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-22 - House - H03 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - S03 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S03 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - S03 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S03 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-24 | (H) Failed CoW; Indef Postponed | |
2010-02-22 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-22 | (H03) Recommended Do Pass | |
2010-02-17 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H03 | |
2010-02-12 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-02-11 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-10 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-10 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-10 | (S03) Recommended Do Pass | |
2010-02-08 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S03 | |
2010-02-08 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2009-12-22 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2010/Digest/SF0017.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2010/Introduced/SF0017.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2010/Digest/SF0017.htm |