WY SF0013 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to alcoholic beverages; amending bar and grill liquor license requirements; specifying sunset dates for bar and grill license population formulas; providing for rulemaking; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Bar and grill liquor license phaseout.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - Senate - Concur:Passed 24-4-0-0-3 (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Concur:S Bill Reconsideration Motion Passed by Roll Call 30-1-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Concur:Passed 25-4-0-0-2 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 38-24-0-0-0 (Y: 38 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-8-0-0-3 (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-0-0-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Concur:S Bill Reconsideration Motion Passed by Roll Call 30-1-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Concur:Passed 25-4-0-0-2 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 38-24-0-0-0 (Y: 38 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-8-0-0-3 (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-0-0-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-15 | Assigned Chapter Number 20 | |
2023-02-15 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0005 | |
2023-02-14 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0005 |
2023-02-13 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0005 |
2023-02-13 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0005 | |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Concur:Passed 24-4-0-0-3 |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Concur:S Bill Reconsideration Motion Passed by Roll Call 30-1-0-0-0 |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Concur:Passed 25-4-0-0-2 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2023-02-09 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 38-24-0-0-0 |
2023-02-08 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-07 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-02-06 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-02-06 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 |
2023-02-03 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2023-01-24 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-24 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 20-8-0-0-3 |
2023-01-20 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-19 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-01-19 | Senate | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-0-0-1 |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2022-12-28 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2022-12-01 | Bill Number Assigned |