WY SF0011 | 2010 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 26 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-26 - (S) Did Concur
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 26 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-26 - (S) Did Concur
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to state parks and cultural resources; providing for de minimus acquisitions, disposals, designations or removal of designations of state outdoor recreational resources by the department without legislative approval; providing for rulemaking; and providing for an effective date.
Title
State parks-acquisition and disposition of lands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-26 - Senate - S Did Concur (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - House - H06 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - S06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S06 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - House - H06 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - S06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S06 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-26 | (S) Did Concur | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-02-25 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-24 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-19 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-19 | (H06) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2010-02-17 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H06 | |
2010-02-12 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-02-11 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-10 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-10 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-10 | (S06) Recommended Do Pass | |
2010-02-08 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S06 | |
2010-02-08 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2009-12-07 | Bill Number Assigned |