WY SF0006 | 2024 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-23 - Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor
Pending: Joint Labor, Health & Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to professions and occupations; authorizing the board of nursing home administrators to issue temporary licenses for nursing home administrators as specified; making conforming amendments; requiring rulemaking; and providing for effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nursing home administrators-temporary licenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-1-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 31-0-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-23HouseIntroduced and Referred to H10 - Labor
2024-02-21HouseReceived for Introduction
2024-02-21Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-1-0-0
2024-02-20Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2024-02-19SenateCOW:Passed
2024-02-16SenatePlaced on General File
2024-02-16SenateS10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2024-02-12SenateIntroduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 31-0-0-0-0
2024-01-24SenateReceived for Introduction
2023-11-30 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback