WY SF0006 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Chapter No. 110 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Chapter No. 110 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to radioactive waste storage facilities; increasing the initial application deposit amount; authorizing the director to apply for other funds as specified; amending deadlines and public hearing requirements for reports for the siting of high-level radioactive waste storage facilities; removing obsolete language; increasing the fee related to feasibility agreements; increasing penalties; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Radioactive waste storage facilities- amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-24 - House - Adopted SF0006JC002: 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - Adopted SF0006JC002: 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Adopted SF0006JC002: 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Adopted SF0006JC002: 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - Did Not Adopt SF0006JC001: 18-41-1-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - House - Did Not Adopt SF0006JC001: 18-41-1-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Adopted SF0006JC001: 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Adopted SF0006JC001: 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Concur:Failed 6-23-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Concur:Bill reconsideration motion passed 24-5-1-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Concur:Passed 22-7-1-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Concur:Failed 6-23-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Concur:Bill reconsideration motion passed by roll call 24-5-1- (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Concur:Passed 22-7-1-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - Adopted SF0006JC002: 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Adopted SF0006JC002: 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Adopted SF0006JC002: 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - Did Not Adopt SF0006JC001: 18-41-1-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - House - Did Not Adopt SF0006JC001: 18-41-1-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Adopted SF0006JC001: 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Adopted SF0006JC001: 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Concur:Failed 6-23-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Concur:Bill reconsideration motion passed 24-5-1-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Concur:Passed 22-7-1-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Concur:Failed 6-23-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Concur:Bill reconsideration motion passed by roll call 24-5-1- (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Concur:Passed 22-7-1-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | Chapter No. 110 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017 | |
2017-03-06 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2017-03-06 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0045 | |
2017-02-27 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0045 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0045 |
2017-02-24 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0045 | |
2017-02-24 | House | Adopted SF0006JC002: 60-0-0-0-0 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Adopted SF0006JC002: 28-0-2-0-0 |
2017-02-22 | Pursuant to JR 2-1(c):S Appointed JCC02 Members | |
2017-02-21 | Pursuant to JR 2-1(c): H Appointed JCC02 Members | |
2017-02-21 | House | Did Not Adopt SF0006JC001: 18-41-1-0-0 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Adopted SF0006JC001: 28-0-2-0-0 |
2017-02-14 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Concur:Failed 6-23-1-0-0 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Concur:Bill reconsideration motion passed 24-5-1-0-0 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Concur:Passed 22-7-1-0-0 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2017-02-13 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 |
2017-02-10 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-09 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-02-06 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-02-06 | House | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2017-02-02 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2017-01-23 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-18 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-01-16 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-01-16 | Senate | S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2016-11-29 | Bill Number Assigned |