WY SF0005 | 2012 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 1 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0060
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 1 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0060
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to district boards; providing for removal of board members from predator management boards, planning commissions, airport boards, fair boards, public recreation boards, museum boards, solid waste disposal district boards and county health boards; providing a term for vacancies filled; and providing for an effective date.
Title
County commissioners-removal of appointed board members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - House - H Adopted SF0005JC01 (Y: 35 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - S Adopted SF0005JC01 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - S Did Not Concur (Y: 6 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-01 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - H07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - S07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - S07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S07 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S07 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - S Adopted SF0005JC01 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - S Did Not Concur (Y: 6 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-01 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - H07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - S07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - S07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S07 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S07 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0060 | |
2012-03-08 | (S) President Signed SEA No. 0060 | |
2012-03-08 | Assigned Number SEA0060 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Adopted SF0005JC01 | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Adopted SF0005JC01 | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Appointed JCC01 Members | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Appointed JCC01 Members | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Did Not Concur | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Received for Concurrence | |
2012-03-01 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-02-29 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-02-29 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-28 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2012-02-28 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-28 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-28 | (H) Amendments Adopted | |
2012-02-27 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2012-02-27 | (H07) Recommended Do Pass | |
2012-02-22 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H07 | |
2012-02-20 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-02-16 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-02-16 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-16 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-16 | (S) Amendments Adopted | |
2012-02-15 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2012-02-14 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2012-02-14 | (S07) Recommended Do Pass | |
2012-02-13 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S07 | |
2012-02-13 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2011-12-29 | Bill Number Assigned |