WY SF0003 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-12 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-12 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to oil and gas; amending the qualifications necessary for a person to be appointed supervisor of the Wyoming oil and gas conservation commission; and providing for an effective date.
Title
State oil and gas supervisor-qualifications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-07 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - H09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-09 - Senate - S09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - H09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-09 - Senate - S09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-12 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2013-02-11 | Governor Signed SEA0003 | |
2013-02-07 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0003 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0003 |
2013-02-07 | Assigned Number SEA0003 | |
2013-02-07 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-06 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-05 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-01-30 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-30 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 |
2013-01-14 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-01-11 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2012-11-28 | Bill Number Assigned |