WY SF0002 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to telecommunications; extending the sunset date of the Wyoming Telecommunications Act; making conforming changes; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Wyoming telecommunications act-sunset date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-09 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 61-1-0-0-0 (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-16 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 21-10-0-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-12 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-10 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to {NextAssignedTo} 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-16 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 21-10-0-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-12 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-10 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to {NextAssignedTo} 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-15 | Assigned Chapter Number 17 | |
2023-02-15 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0001 | |
2023-02-13 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0001 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0001 |
2023-02-09 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0001 | |
2023-02-09 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 61-1-0-0-0 |
2023-02-08 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-07 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-02-06 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-02-06 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2023-02-03 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2023-01-17 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-16 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 21-10-0-0-0 |
2023-01-13 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-12 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-01-12 | Senate | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2022-12-28 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2022-11-30 | Bill Number Assigned |