WY SF0002 | 2012 | Budget Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-21 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to appropriations for the legislature; providing appropriations for the operation of the legislative branch of state government; and providing for effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriation for the legislature.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-08 - Senate - S Did Concur (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S02 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-21 Assigned Chapter Number
2012-03-21 Governor Signed SEA0057
2012-03-08 (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0057
2012-03-08 (S) President Signed SEA No. 0057
2012-03-08 Assigned Number SEA0057
2012-03-08 (S) Did Concur
2012-03-07 (S) Received for Concurrence
2012-03-07 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2012-03-07 Amendment Adopted
2012-03-06 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2012-03-05 (H) Passed CoW
2012-03-05 Amendment Adopted
2012-03-05 (H) Amendments Adopted
2012-03-02 (H) Placed on General File
2012-03-02 (H02) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2012-02-28 (H) Introduced and Referred to H02
2012-02-28 (H) Received for Introduction
2012-02-28 (S) Passed 3rd Reading
2012-02-27 (S) Passed 2nd Reading
2012-02-24 (S) Passed CoW
2012-02-22 (S) Placed on General File
2012-02-22 (S02) Recommended Do Pass
2012-02-13 (S) Introduced and Referred to S02
2012-02-13 (S) Received for Introduction
2012-01-31 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback