WY HJ0009 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-27 - Did Not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-27 - Did Not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION recognizing National Speech and Debate Education Day.
Title
National speech and debate education day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-27 | Senate | Did Not Consider for Introduction |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-02-06 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 |
2017-02-03 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-02 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-02-01 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-02-01 | House | H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-30 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel |
2017-01-30 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-27 | Bill Number Assigned |