WY HJ0006 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - COW:Failed 3-27-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A JOINT RESOLUTION proposing to amend the Wyoming Constitution by removing distinctions between legislative general and budget sessions including repealing the introductory vote requirement for bills in a legislative budget session and making conforming amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legislative sessions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - Senate - COW:Failed 3-27-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 42-16-2-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-20SenateCOW:Failed 3-27-0-0-0
2019-02-19SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-19SenateS07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
2019-02-07SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-02-06House3rd Reading:Passed 42-16-2-0-0
2019-02-05House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-04HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-23HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-23HouseH09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
2019-01-14HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-11 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback