WY HJ0006 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-01 - ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Barbuto, Berger, Blake, Blikre, Bonner, Botten, Brechtel, Brown, Buchanan, Burkhart, Campbell, Cannady, Childers, Craft, Davison, Eklund, Esquibel, K., Freeman, Gay, Gingery, Goggles, Greear, Greene, Harshman, Harvey, Hunt, Illoway, Jaggi, Kasperik, Kroeker, Krone, Lockhart, Loucks, Lubnau, Madden, McKim, McOmie, Miller, Moniz, Nicholas B, Patton, Peasley, Pederson, Petersen, Petroff, Quarberg, Roscoe, Semlek, Shepperson, Steward, Stubson, Teeters, Throne, Vranish, Wallis, Zwonitzer, Dn. and Zwonitzer, Dv.. Nays: Representative(s) Connolly Excused: Representative(s) Byrd and Edmonds. Ayes 57 Nays 1 Excused 2 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 2/2/2011 S Received for Introduction 2/2/2011 S Introduced and Referred to S06 2/8/2011 S06 Recommended Do Pass ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Christensen, Dockstader and Driskill Nayes: Senator(s) Burns and Esquibel, F. Ayes 3 Nays 2 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 2/8/2011 S Placed on General File 2/10/2011 S Failed CoW; Indef Postponed ROL
Pending: Joint Travel, Recreation, Wildlife & Cultural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A JOINT RESOLUTION requesting Congress to refrain from enacting any laws which restrict private property rights in violation of the United States Constitution; calling on the Wyoming delegation to Congress to resist the enactment of all federal laws which impinge on property rights; calling on all elected officials in Wyoming to recognize and protect property rights as guaranteed by the United States Constitution and the Constitution of the State of Wyoming.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Private property protection.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-01 ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Barbuto, Berger, Blake, Blikre, Bonner, Botten, Brechtel, Brown, Buchanan, Burkhart, Campbell, Cannady, Childers, Craft, Davison, Eklund, Esquibel, K., Freeman, Gay, Gingery, Goggles, Greear, Greene, Harshman, Harvey, Hunt, Illoway, Jaggi, Kasperik, Kroeker, Krone, Lockhart, Loucks, Lubnau, Madden, McKim, McOmie, Miller, Moniz, Nicholas B, Patton, Peasley, Pederson, Petersen, Petroff, Quarberg, Roscoe, Semlek, Shepperson, Steward, Stubson, Teeters, Throne, Vranish, Wallis, Zwonitzer, Dn. and Zwonitzer, Dv.. Nays: Representative(s) Connolly Excused: Representative(s) Byrd and Edmonds. Ayes 57 Nays 1 Excused 2 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 2/2/2011 S Received for Introduction 2/2/2011 S Introduced and Referred to S06 2/8/2011 S06 Recommended Do Pass ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Christensen, Dockstader and Driskill Nayes: Senator(s) Burns and Esquibel, F. Ayes 3 Nays 2 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 2/8/2011 S Placed on General File 2/10/2011 S Failed CoW; Indef Postponed ROL
2011-02-01 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2011-01-31 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2011-01-28 (H) Passed CoW
2011-01-28 Amendment Adopted
2011-01-28 (H) Amendments Adopted
2011-01-26 (H) Placed on General File
2011-01-26 ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Bonner, Botten, Davison, Jaggi, McKim, McOmie, Petroff and Shepperson Nayes: Representative(s) Connolly Ayes 8 Nays 1 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
2011-01-26 (H06) Recommended Do Pass
2011-01-21 (H) Introduced and Referred to H06
2011-01-19 (H) Received for Introduction
2011-01-18 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback