WY HJ0005 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 0-7-0-
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 0-7-0-
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION proposing to amend the Wyoming Constitution to require that proceeds from mineral excise taxes imposed by the Constitution be deposited in the general fund for a specified period.
Title
Mineral excise tax deposits-constitutional amendment.
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Hallinan [R] | Rep. Stan Blake [D] | Rep. Scott Clem [R] | Sen. Dan Furphy [R] |
Rep. Garry Piiparinen [R] | Sen. Jeff Wasserburger [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 0-7-0- (Y: 0 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 0-7-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 0-7-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 0-7-0- | |
2017-02-03 | House | No report prior to COW Cutoff |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2017-01-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-07 | Bill Number Assigned |