WY HJ0005 | 2014 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - Governor Signed HEJR002
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - Governor Signed HEJR002
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION to the United States secretary of the interior, the director of the national park service and the superintendent of Grand Teton National Park relating to maintenance of the Moose-Wilson road.
Title
Moose-Wilson roadway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - S08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - H08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H08 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - S08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - H08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H08 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | Governor Signed HEJR002 | |
2014-03-05 | Senate | President Signed HEJR No. 0002 |
2014-03-04 | House | Speaker Signed HEJR No. 0002 |
2014-03-04 | Assigned Number HEJR0002 | |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2014-02-24 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-02-21 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-02-20 | House | Passed CoW |
2014-02-19 | House | Placed on General File |
2014-02-19 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2014-02-14 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 |
2014-02-13 | House | Received for Introduction |
2014-02-12 | Bill Number Assigned |