WY HJ0005 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-25 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-25 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION proposing to amend the Wyoming Constitution to require courts in this state to rely on federal and state laws when deciding cases and to forbid courts from using international law as precedent when deciding cases.
Title
Foreign law prohibition-2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-25 | House | Died In Committee |
2013-02-04 | House | Introduced and referred to H01; No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2013-01-29 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 |
2013-01-28 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-28 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/HJ0005.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Introduced/HJ0005.pdf |