WY HJ0002 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 2-7-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A JOINT RESOLUTION proposing to amend the Wyoming Constitution relating to education; providing the general supervision of public schools shall be prescribed by law effective January 7, 2019; eliminating the elected state superintendent as an elected official on and after January 7, 2019; removing the state superintendent as an ex officio member of University of Wyoming board of trustees and from the board of land commissioners on and after January 7, 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State superintendent of public instruction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-04 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 2-7-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-04 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 2-7-0- (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-04 H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 2-7-0-0-0
2015-02-09HouseNo report prior to CoW Cutoff
2015-01-13HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04 - Education
2015-01-13HouseReceived for Introduction
2014-12-12 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback