WY HJ0002 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-10 - ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Barnard, Case, Dockstader, Meier and Nutting. Nays: Senator(s) Burns, Christensen, Coe, Cooper, Driskill, Emerich, Esquibel, F., Geis, Hastert, Hicks, Hines, Jennings, Johnson, Landen, Martin, Nicholas P, Peterson, Ross, Rothfuss, Schiffer, Scott and Von Flatern. Excused: Senator(s) Anderson, Bebout and Perkins. Ayes 5 Nays 22 Excused 3 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

<billtitle>

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolution-U.S. constitution requiring a balanced budget.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-10 ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Barnard, Case, Dockstader, Meier and Nutting. Nays: Senator(s) Burns, Christensen, Coe, Cooper, Driskill, Emerich, Esquibel, F., Geis, Hastert, Hicks, Hines, Jennings, Johnson, Landen, Martin, Nicholas P, Peterson, Ross, Rothfuss, Schiffer, Scott and Von Flatern. Excused: Senator(s) Anderson, Bebout and Perkins. Ayes 5 Nays 22 Excused 3 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
2011-02-10 (S) Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
2011-02-04 (S) Placed on General File
2011-02-04 ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Barnard, Case, Emerich and Hines Nayes: Senator(s) Perkins Ayes 4 Nays 1 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
2011-02-04 (S03) Recommended Do Pass
2011-01-27 (S) Introduced and Referred to S03
2011-01-25 (S) Received for Introduction
2011-01-21 ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Berger, Blikre, Bonner, Botten, Brechtel, Brown, Buchanan, Burkhart, Campbell, Cannady, Childers, Edmonds, Eklund, Esquibel, K., Gay, Gingery, Greear, Greene, Harshman, Harvey, Hunt, Illoway, Jaggi, Kasperik, Kroeker, Krone, Lockhart, Loucks, Lubnau, Madden, McOmie, Miller, Moniz, Nicholas B, Patton, Peasley, Pederson, Petersen, Petroff, Quarberg, Semlek, Shepperson, Steward, Stubson, Teeters, Vranish, Wallis, Zwonitzer, Dn. and Zwonitzer, Dv.. Nays: Representative(s) Barbuto, Blake, Byrd, Connolly, Craft, Freeman, Roscoe and Throne. Excused: Representative(s) Davison, Goggles and McKim. Ayes 49 Nays 8 Excused 3 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
2011-01-21 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2011-01-20 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2011-01-19 (H) Passed CoW
2011-01-19 Amendment Adopted
2011-01-19 (H) Amendments Adopted
2011-01-17 (H) Placed on General File
2011-01-17 ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Blikre, Campbell, Childers, Madden, Miller, Petersen, Semlek M and Vranish Excused: Representative(s) Goggles Ayes 8 Nays 0 Excused 1 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
2011-01-17 (H03) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2011-01-12 (H) Introduced and Referred to H03
2011-01-11 (H) Received for Introduction
2011-01-06 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback